Immigrants and Citizenship

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0272Higher Education - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sanctuary Campus StatusDelegate QueenIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0539Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0598Counties and Municipal Corporations - "Sanctuary Laws" for Illegal Aliens - ProhibitionDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0908Police Officer Certification Work Group - Eligibility of Individuals with Permanent Residency StatusDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1074Courts - Sanctuary Programs - Citizen Standing to Seek InjunctionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1208
    (SB0616)
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Ramirez)Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1307
    (SB1016)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1354
    (SB0842)
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017Delegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1362
    (SB0835)
Criminal Procedure - Immigration - Community TrustDelegate MoralesIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1366Labor and Employment - Number of Employees Granted H-1B or L-1 Visa - DisclosureDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1508
    (SB1000)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1523
    (SB1070)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Regional Education and Training CenterDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0130 / CH0282Election Law - Ballot Issues - Contributions or Donations by Foreign PrincipalsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 282Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0616
    (HB1208)
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim HelpfulnessSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0830Correctional Facilities - Individual Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security NotificationSenator HoughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0835
    (HB1362)
Maryland Law Enforcement and Governmental Trust ActSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0842
    (HB1354)
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2017Senator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0883Municipal Elections - Voting by Individuals Not Lawfully Present in the United StatesSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Municipalities (L3)
SB1000
    (HB1508)
Higher Education - Tuition Rates - ExemptionsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1016
    (HB1307)
Labor and Employment - Regulation of Farm Labor Contractors and Foreign Labor ContractorsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB1070
    (HB1523)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Baltimore Regional Education and Training CenterSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.