Indigent Persons

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0280 / CH0453
    (SB0931 / CH0452)
Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of FeeDelegate MoonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0400 / CH0263Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - ModificationsDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0411 / CH0104General Assembly - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - MembershipDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0489 / CH0321Termination of Maryland Health Insurance Plan, Transfer of Senior Prescription Drug Assistance Program, and Funding for State Reinsurance ProgramDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 321Health and Government Operations
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0497 / CH0360
    (SB0200 / CH0359)
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and RevisionsDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0536
    (SB0478)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 206 West Social Enterprise ProjectDelegate BuschIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0591Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for ServicesDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0593 / CH0332
    (SB0022 / CH0331)
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - MembershipDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0646
    (SB0593)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Delegate DumaisIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0748Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Job Training Grant Program - EstablishmentDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1021 / CH0730Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16Prince George's County DelegationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1139 / CH0300Education - Community School Strategy - Required Notice and SupportDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1288 / CH0306Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless YouthDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1482
    (SB0920)
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather PlanningDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1500Human Resources - Homeless Shelters - Safety and Security MeasuresDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1501Governor's Office for Children - Family Navigators ProgramDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1503 / CH0141Adult Education - GED Testing Fees - Exemption for Homeless YouthDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1515Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Indigency DeterminationsDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1566
    (SB0488)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Sarah's HopeDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1582
    (SB1071)
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload StandardsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1638Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - FundingDelegate McKayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0022 / CH0331
    (HB0593 / CH0332)
Human Services - Interagency Council on Homelessness - MembershipSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 331Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0094 / CH0344Workforce Development - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0200 / CH0359
    (HB0497 / CH0360)
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and RevisionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0478
    (HB0536)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - 206 West Social Enterprise ProjectSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0488
    (HB1566)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Sarah's HopeSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0920
    (HB1482)
Human Services - Homelessness - Emergency Cold Weather PlanningSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0931 / CH0452
    (HB0280 / CH0453)
Birth Certificates - Homeless Individuals - Prohibition on Collection of FeeSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1071
    (HB1582)
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload StandardsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1156Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public DefenderSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.