Information Technology, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0269
    (SB0180)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National StandardsDelegate Lewis, J.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0568 / CH0381Education - Student Data GovernanceDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0961 / CH0176Rural Broadband Communication ServicesDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1088 / CH0631State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual AccessDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Health and Government Operations
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1206Department of Information Technology - Remote Access Information Program - EstablishmentDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1331 / CH0524Election Law - CybersecurityDelegate Washington, A.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0029 / CH0733State Government - Websites - Language AccessSenator KaganApproved by the Governor - Chapter 733Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0180
    (HB0269)
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National StandardsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0286 / CH0632State Procurement - Information Technology - Nonvisual AccessSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0482Remote Access Information Program for Deaf-Blind Individuals - EstablishmentSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0553 / CH0467State Government - Security Training - Protection of Security-Sensitive DataSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 467Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0882Procurement - Telecommunication and Computer Network Access - Security RequirementsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:36 A.M.