Insects

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0132 / CH0614State Government - Pollinator Habitat PlansDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0211 / CH0662
    (SB0198 / CH0661)
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)Delegate HealeyEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0870 / CH0585
    (SB0876 / CH0584)
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington CountyDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1102Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and PollinatorsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0198 / CH0661
    (HB0211 / CH0662)
Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)Senator Nathan-PulliamEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0876 / CH0584
    (HB0870 / CH0585)
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington CountySenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 584Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1154Courts - Limitation on Damages Arising Out of Bedbug ExterminationSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1163Baltimore County - Marinas Infested With Midges - Funding for LarvicideSenator SallingIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.