Inspections

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0147Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Inspections and Statements During Initial License Year MC 7-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0166Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0184Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of Inspector General - Establishment PG 508-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0200
    (SB0064)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading FinanceEconomic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0309Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - RegulationAnne Arundel County DelegationIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsHealth and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0310Public Safety – Elevators – Periodic InspectionsDelegate WivellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0355
    (SB0302)
Accountability in Education Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0419Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0677
    (SB0477)
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone NumbersDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0698Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - EstablishmentDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0768Election Law - Online Political Advertisements and Campaign Material - DisclosureDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0813Public Safety - Community Program Fund - Firearm LawsDelegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0981
    (SB0875)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1089
    (SB0894)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1107
    (SB0831)
Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - TestingDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1263Foreclosed Property Registry - Duty to Inspect and Maintain Properties in Baltimore CityDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1399
    (SB0833)
Task Force on the Regulation of CaterersDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1559Court Records - Unserved Arrest Warrant and Charging Document - Inspection by AttorneyDelegate VallarioIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1662No More Puppy-Mill Pups Act of 2018Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 2:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0004Department of Aging - Study of Nursing Home Quality of CareSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0010Property Tax Assessments - Physical Inspection of PropertySenator KasemeyerIn the House - First Reading Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Ways and MeansTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0064
    (HB0200)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0167
    (HB0387)
Public Information Act - Suits Filed by Custodians - ProhibitionSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0302
    (HB0355)
Accountability in Education Act of 2018PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:45 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0453Insurance Article - References to Vehicles and Automobiles - ConsistencySenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0469Public Health - School Buildings - Minimum Health Standards (Healthy Schools Program)Senator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0477
    (HB0677)
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Physical Addresses, E-Mail Addresses, and Telephone NumbersSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0587Department of Human Services - Baltimore City Department of Social Services - AuditSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0831
    (HB1107)
Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - TestingSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0833
    (HB1399)
Task Force on the Regulation of CaterersSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0894
    (HB1089)
Metro Oversight Enhancement ActSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0908Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1201Agriculture - Industrial Hemp Pilot Program - EstablishmentSenator ConwayAgriculture (M4)

February 21, 2018 4:56 P.M.