Interest

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0249 / CH0489
    (SB0345 / CH0488)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB0451 / CH0228Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food DesertsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0553 / CH0410Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan ProgramChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0602 / CH0603Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 603Environmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0612
    (SB0575 / CH0304)
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and ClarificationDelegate GriffithVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0683Real Property - Residential and Mobile Home Park Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0686
    (SB0423)
Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0735
    (SB0583 / CH0306)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsDelegate OlszewskiVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0740 / CH0535
    (SB0603 / CH0534)
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment FundDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 535Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0831 / CH0347
    (SB0846 / CH0346)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Delegate BranchApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1060 / CH0571
    (SB0889 / CH0570)
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation AuthorityDelegate JamesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 571Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1251
    (SB0921)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustDelegate HuckerIn the House - Reassigned to Economic Matters and AppropriationsEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1269Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1319Real Property - Foreclosures - Deficiency Judgments Prohibited and Definition of "Secured Party" (Foreclosure Protection Act)Delegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1323
    (SB0927)
Public School Construction - Creative Financing StudyDelegate KaiserIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1342
    (SB0507)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Repackaged and Relabeled Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsDelegate TarrantIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0039Back Taxes - No Penalty, No InterestSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0345 / CH0488
    (HB0249 / CH0489)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0423
    (HB0686)
Tax Overpayment - Interest on RefundsSenator KasemeyerIn the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0450Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0507
    (HB1342)
Workers' Compensation - Reimbursement for Repackaged and Relabeled Drugs - Fee Schedule and RequirementsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
SB0523Task Force to Study a Program for Interest-Free Loans to STEM College Students in MarylandSenator FeldmanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Higher Education (F2)
SB0575 / CH0304
    (HB0612)
State Retirement and Pension System - Code Simplification and ClarificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 304Budget and Taxation
2/6/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0583 / CH0306
    (HB0735)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0603 / CH0534
    (HB0740 / CH0535)
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Cybersecurity Investment FundSenator DeGrangeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 534Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0846 / CH0346
    (HB0831 / CH0347)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2014Senator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0889 / CH0570
    (HB1060 / CH0571)
Northeastern Maryland Additive Manufacturing Innovation AuthoritySenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 570Finance
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0903Tax Sales - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Temporary ProhibitionSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0921
    (HB1251)
Maryland Secure Choice Retirement Savings Program and TrustSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 8:30 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
2/20/2014 - 8:30 a.m.
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0927
    (HB1323)
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund ProgramSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0985 / CH0365Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - StudySenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.