International Affairs

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0800 / CH0710
    (SB0934 / CH0711)
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of DentistryDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 710Health and Government Operations
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0981 / CH0834
    (SB0875 / CH0833)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActDelegate Washington, A.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 834Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB1787State Government - Prevention of Genocide and Crimes Against Humanity and the Commission on Genocide PreventionDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HJ0014Support for the People of IranDelegate McComasIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0875 / CH0833
    (HB0981 / CH0834)
Online Electioneering Transparency and Accountability ActSenator ZuckerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 833Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0934 / CH0711
    (HB0800 / CH0710)
State Board of Dental Examiners - Licensure - Faculty Members at the University of Maryland School of DentistrySenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 711Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.