Investments

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0140 / CH0252State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Supervision of Appraiser TraineesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 252Economic Matters
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0202 / CH0268
    (SB0255 / CH0267)
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement ExemptionDelegate Barnes, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2017 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0230Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings AccountsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0246 / CH0254Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Occupational Mechanical Licensing Boards - Fund and FeesChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0373 / CH0475
    (SB0226 / CH0476)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - DefinitionDelegate Barnes, D.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475Ways and Means
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0402
    (SB0307 / CH0030)
Repeal of the Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 (Road Kill Bill Repeal)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0442Volkswagen Settlement Funds - Use of Environmental Mitigation TrustDelegate RobinsonIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0487
    (SB0267)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Composition and LicensesDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0503 / CH0004
    (SB0371 / CH0550)
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization AccountDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Appropriations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0589Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Corporate Bylaws and Elections of Directors and TrusteesDelegate FrickIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB0832
    (SB0384 / CH0081)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization DistrictDelegate McIntoshVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0915
    (SB0605)
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional TaxDelegate TarlauIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0949
    (SB0739)
Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of IsraelDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1064
    (SB0478)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1149 / CH0837
    (SB0951 / CH0838)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsDelegate KramerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837Economic Matters
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1184Corporations and Associations - Filing Fees - ReductionsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1348 / CH0600
    (SB1035)
Baltimore City - 46th District Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2017Delegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 600Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1367Personal Property Tax - Investments in MarylandDelegate FisherIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HJ0004Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0213Maryland College Investment Plan - State Contribution to Account Holders - AlterationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0226 / CH0476
    (HB0373 / CH0475)
Biotechnology Investment Tax Credit - Qualified Maryland Biotechnology Company - DefinitionSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 476Budget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0255 / CH0267
    (HB0202 / CH0268)
State Retirement and Pension System - Authority to Arrange Custody of Investments and Procurement ExemptionSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
2/2/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0267
    (HB0487)
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Composition and LicensesSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0307 / CH0030
    (HB0402)
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act - Application and EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 30Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0353 / CH0528
    (HB0304 / CH0527)
Optional Retirement Program - Annuity Contracts - Employee RightsSenator GuzzoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Budget and Taxation
2/2/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0371 / CH0550
    (HB0503 / CH0004)
State Budget - Appropriations - Income Tax Revenue Estimate Cap and Revenue Stabilization AccountSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 550Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0384 / CH0081
    (HB0832)
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0478
    (HB1064)
State Retirement and Pension System - Guaranteed Retirement Income Plan and Retirement Savings PlanSenator EckardtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0605
    (HB0915)
Income Tax - Carried Interest - Additional TaxSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0739
    (HB0949)
Procurement and Pensions - State Sanctions - Discriminatory Boycott of IsraelSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 2:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/1/2017 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0951 / CH0838
    (HB1149 / CH0837)
Maryland Securities Act - Vulnerable AdultsSenator SmithEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 838Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1035
    (HB1348 / CH0600)
Baltimore City - 46th District Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2017Senator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:58 A.M.