Judgments

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0309Courts - Discovery - Examination in Aid of Enforcement of Money JudgmentDelegate NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0419 / CH0370Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid TaxDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0596 / CH0622
    (SB0419)
Civil Actions - Interrogatories or Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to Appear to Show CauseDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 622Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0597
    (SB0418)
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to AppearDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0600
    (SB0502)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and FinanceHealth and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Public Health (J1)
HB0628Real Property - Maryland Contract Lien Act - Monetary JudgmentsDelegate NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0764
    (SB0803)
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - LimitationDelegate JamesonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0923Certificate of a Qualified Expert - Lead Paint Poisoning ClaimsDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0954
    (SB0763)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - RequiredDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1114
    (SB0836)
Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic PaymentsDelegate MitchellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1140 / CH0528
    (SB0697 / CH0527)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1316
    (SB0771)
Postjudgment Interest - Medical InjuryDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1330 / CH0676Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer ComplianceChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0210Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2013)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0293Vehicle Laws - Judgment Debtors - License and Registration Suspension - ModificationSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0418
    (HB0597)
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Prohibition on Arrest or Incarceration for Failure to AppearSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0419
    (HB0596 / CH0622)
Civil Actions - Examination in Aid of Enforcement - Procedure After Arrest for Failure to AppearSenator FroshIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0502
    (HB0600)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party TortfeasorsSenator AstleIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Public Health (J1)
SB0697 / CH0527
    (HB1140 / CH0528)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0763
    (HB0954)
Property and Casualty Insurance - Vessel Liability Coverage - RequiredSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0771
    (HB1316)
Postjudgment Interest - Medical InjurySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0803
    (HB0764)
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Personal Injury Protection and Uninsured Motorist Coverages - LimitationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0836
    (HB1114)
Health Care Malpractice - Awards and Judgments - Periodic PaymentsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0970Private Property Rights - Regulatory Infringement - CompensationSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.