Judgments

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 35

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0066 / CH0088Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - RepealChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
HB0171
    (SB0231)
Judgments - Appeals - Supersedeas BondDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0249 / CH0561
    (SB0557 / CH0560)
Members of the National Guard - Employment and Reemployment Rights - EnforcementDelegate SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 561Economic Matters
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0336 / CH0619
    (SB0161 / CH0658)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureDelegate VallarioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 619Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0441Public Health - Assisted Outpatient Treatment and Mobile Crisis TeamsDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsPublic Health (J1)
HB0565 / CH0514Criminal Law - Possession of Less Than 10 Grams of Marijuana - Code ViolationDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 514Judiciary
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0576 / CH0398
    (SB0525 / CH0399)
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - ClarificationDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0623
    (SB0866)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking VictimDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0667
    (SB0553)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageDelegate BarkleyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0762Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0856State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - RequiredDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0885Behavioral Health Administration - Creation and Maintenance of Mental Health Professional Profiles (Patient Protection Provider Information Act)Delegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0890 / CH0129
    (SB0996)
St. Mary's County - Local Landlord and Tenant Law - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0912 / CH0447
    (SB0888 / CH0446)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be InsuredDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 447Economic Matters
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0920 / CH0396
    (SB0509 / CH0395)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0992Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - RepealDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1154
    (SB0951)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1460
    (SB0709)
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1491
    (SB0771 / CH0579)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - RestrictionsSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0161 / CH0658
    (HB0336 / CH0619)
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and ForfeitureSenator HoughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0231
    (HB0171)
Judgments - Appeals - Supersedeas BondSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0456Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0509 / CH0395
    (HB0920 / CH0396)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0525 / CH0399
    (HB0576 / CH0398)
Maryland Dormant Minerals Interests Act - Use of Mineral Interest - ClarificationSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0553
    (HB0667)
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist CoverageSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0557 / CH0560
    (HB0249 / CH0561)
Members of the National Guard - Employment and Reemployment Rights - EnforcementSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0565Civil Actions - Offers of JudgmentSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0709
    (HB1460)
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0771 / CH0579
    (HB1491)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Consumer Debt Collection Actions - RestrictionsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0866
    (HB0623)
Criminal Procedure - Postconviction Review - Conviction of Human Trafficking VictimSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0888 / CH0446
    (HB0912 / CH0447)
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Program to Incentivize and Enable Uninsured Vehicle Owners to Be InsuredSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 446Finance
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0951
    (HB1154)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0996
    (HB0890 / CH0129)
St. Mary's County - Local Landlord and Tenant Law - RepealSenator WaughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.