Judgments

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0222
    (SB0528)
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Delegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0502
    (SB0480)
Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate JudgmentDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1435
    (SB0725)
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body AttachmentDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1494
    (SB0459 / CH0807)
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment ProhibitionDelegate Wilson, C.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
RulesInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1496Tax Sales - Property Maintenance and Nuisance Condition Violation JudgmentsAllegany County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1511
    (SB0626)
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0459 / CH0807
    (HB1494)
Bail Bond - Installment Contract - Form and Confessed Judgment ProhibitionSenator FeldmanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 807Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0480
    (HB0502)
Criminal Procedure - Shieldable Conviction - Motion to Vacate JudgmentSenator LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0528
    (HB0222)
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazards (Sunshine in Litigation Act)Senator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0626
    (HB1511)
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by EmployeesSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0725
    (HB1435)
Civil Actions - Discovery in Aid of Enforcement of Money Judgment - Body AttachmentSenator SmithIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0922Business Regulation - State Junk Licenses and Trader's Licenses - ApplicantsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0950Debt Collection - Attachment and Execution - ExemptionsSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:17 P.M.