Judicial Review

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0049Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialityDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansElections (G1)
HB0256 / CH0610Frederick County - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Direct Judicial ReviewFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 610Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0274
    (SB0345)
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - Psychology Associates - RegistrationDelegate HubbardIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0302Maryland Medical Marijuana ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0413
    (SB0010)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0437
    (SB0753)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0729
    (SB0367)
Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0775 / CH0524
    (SB0675 / CH0523)
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information WorkgroupDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 524Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0809Firearms - Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository - Reporting, Qualifications for Possession, and Relief from DisqualificationDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0967Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of LimitationsDelegate McDermottIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1044
    (SB0584)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1290
    (SB0837)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysDelegate FrankIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1296 / CH0597
    (SB0981 / CH0596)
State Board of Physicians - Quasi-Judicial Powers and the Board of Review - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 597Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0010
    (HB0413)
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Selection of MembersSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0053 / CH0171Department of Agriculture - Administrative Review of Contested CasesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 171Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0235 / CH0210Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - License RevocationSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 210Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0367
    (HB0729)
Election Law - Petitions - ConfidentialitySenator JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0510 / CH0490Institutions of Higher Education - Fully Online Distance Education Programs - RegulationSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 490Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0584
    (HB1044)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0675 / CH0523
    (HB0775 / CH0524)
Maryland Pesticide Reporting and Information WorkgroupSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 523Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental MattersAgriculture (M4)
SB0753
    (HB0437)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0783
    (HB1029)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0837
    (HB1290)
Health Occupations Boards - Disciplinary Procedures - Prohibition on StaysSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1008Sewage Sludge Utilization Permits - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area - Judicial ReviewSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.