Juries

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0589Firearms Freedom ActDelegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryPublic Safety (E4)
HB0595
    (SB0609)
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - ProhibitionDelegate DavisIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB0599Courts - Jury Service - Employer CompensationDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0787Criminal Law - Reckless Endangerment - Repeal of Specific Charging RequirementDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0480Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder on School or Child Care Facility PropertySenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0609
    (HB0595)
Workers' Compensation - Retaliation by Employer - ProhibitionSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.