Jurisdiction

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 36

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0073 / CH0396
    (SB0192)
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015Delegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HB0131 / CH0069
    (SB0087)
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for ExpungementChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 69Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0164 / CH0225
    (SB0301)
Judgments - Appeals - Supersedeas BondDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 225Judiciary
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0220
    (SB0273)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0288Vehicle Laws - Regulation of Parking - JurisdictionDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0350Child Custody and Visitation - Deployed ParentsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0365Criminal Procedure - Felony Prosecution of Law Enforcement Officer - Attorney GeneralDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0427Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - EstablishmentDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0428Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - EstablishmentDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0434Courts - Aggravated Murder CourtDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0457Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Law Enforcement Officer, Correctional Officer, First Responder, or WitnessDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0461District Court - Civil Jurisdiction - Amount in ControversyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0586
    (SB0476)
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Feasibility of Repeal of Excluded OffensesDelegate CarterIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0638Natural Resources - Oysters - Shell Seeding, Shell Replenishment, and Rotational HarvestDelegate HolmesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0719District Court Jurisdiction - Uninsured Motorist ClaimDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0738 / CH0271Jurisdiction of the State Ethics Commission and the Maryland State Board of Contract Appeals - Participation in ProcurementDelegate KrebsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0850
    (SB0448)
Congressional Districts - Standards and ProcessDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0906Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and ProcessesDelegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0938
    (SB0564 / CH0365)
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in Zoning MC/PG 112-15Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1129
    (SB0837)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1188 / CH0302Maryland Capitol Police of the Department of General ServicesChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 302Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1221Maryland Affordable Housing Trust - Award Criteria - Preference for Multijurisdictional ApplicantsDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB1239Civil Penalties for Shoplifting and Employee Theft - RepealDelegate LiermanIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1289 / CH0308
    (SB0941)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Judiciary
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0087
    (HB0131 / CH0069)
Criminal Procedure - Transfer to Juvenile Court - Petition for ExpungementChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0192
    (HB0073 / CH0396)
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2015Senator PinskyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB0252Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0273
    (HB0220)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0301
    (HB0164 / CH0225)
Judgments - Appeals - Supersedeas BondSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0379Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge AuthoritySenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0448
    (HB0850)
Congressional Districts - Standards and ProcessSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0476
    (HB0586)
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Court Jurisdiction - Feasibility of Repeal of Excluded OffensesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0564 / CH0365
    (HB0938)
Prince George's County - Maryland-Washington Regional District - Fairness in ZoningSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0616Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local LicensesSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0837
    (HB1129)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleSenator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0941
    (HB1289 / CH0308)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.