Juvenile Services, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0036 / CH0580Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate JacksonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 580Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0354
    (SB0299 / CH0579)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Correctional Officers (Hometown Heroes Act of 2018)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0414Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipDelegate VogtIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 2:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0479
    (SB1066)
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health AssessmentDelegate MosbyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0827
    (SB0669)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0922 / CH0211Maryland Department of Health – "Pill Mill" Tip Line and Overdose ReportDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1244
    (SB0657)
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education SystemDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1494
    (SB0964)
Social Services – Safe Harbor Child Trafficking Victim Service Pilot ProgramDelegate MoralesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1524
    (SB1134)
Juvenile Justice Coordinating CouncilDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Judiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1607 / CH0565Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and OperationDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Ways and Means
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1702
    (SB1147)
Juveniles - Reportable OffensesWashington County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1747 / CH0799Residential Child Care Programs - Statement of Need - ExceptionsDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 799Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0091 / CH0669Juvenile Law - Disclosure of Court RecordsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 669Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0299 / CH0579
    (HB0354)
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – MembershipPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0510Correctional Officers' Retirement System - MembershipSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 9:30 a.m.Budget and Taxation
2/8/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0657
    (HB1244)
Workgroup on Establishing an Independent School Board for the Juvenile Services Education SystemSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0669
    (HB0827)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0964
    (HB1494)
Social Services - Youth Victims of Human Trafficking - Workgroup Revisions and ReportsSenator LeeIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1066
    (HB0479)
Juvenile Law - Lead Testing and Behavioral Health AssessmentSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1134
    (HB1524)
Juvenile Justice Coordinating CouncilSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1147
    (HB1702)
Juveniles – Reportable OffensesWashington County SenatorsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.