Labor and Industry, Division of

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0104Occupational Safety and Health - Good Faith Actions by Business Owners - Penalty ForgivenessDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0296
    (SB0305 / CH0224)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0317State Government - E-Verify ProgramDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0330
    (SB0555)
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work ContractsSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1130 / CH0541
    (SB0758 / CH0540)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 541Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1204
    (SB0683)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1283Prevailing Wage Enforcement ActDelegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1317Labor and Employment - Division of Labor and Industry - AppropriationsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0305 / CH0224
    (HB0296)
Division of Labor and Industry and Associated Boards and Councils - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224Finance
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0553 / CH0499Tipped Employees - Payments or Deduction from Wages - ProhibitionSenator GettyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 499Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0555
    (HB0330)
Construction Safety and Health Training - Public Work ContractsSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0664Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0683
    (HB1204)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0758 / CH0540
    (HB1130 / CH0541)
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - EstablishmentSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 540Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.