Labor and Industry, Division of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0187Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0257
    (SB0293 / CH0288)
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0467 / CH0100Labor and Employment - Employment of MinorsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 100Economic Matters
2/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0527Labor and Employment - Earned Sick LeaveDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0579 / CH0411Commissioner of Labor and Industry - Authority - Enforcement of Local Minimum Wage LawsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 411Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0725
    (SB0883)
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other RightsDelegate BarnesIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0956Prevailing Wage Enforcement ActDelegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0968
    (SB0753)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1026 / CH0334
    (SB0737 / CH0333)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1207 / CH0646Division of Labor and Industry - Youth Apprenticeship Advisory CommitteeDelegate SimmonsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1293Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Servers - RegistrationDelegate VaughnIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0054 / CH0120Labor and Employment - Maryland Apprenticeship and Training CouncilChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 120Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0204Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0293 / CH0288
    (HB0257)
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0371Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesSenator CurrieIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0737 / CH0333
    (HB1026 / CH0334)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0753
    (HB0968)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0883
    (HB0725)
State-Owned Airport Concessionaire Employees - Payment of Wages and Other RightsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.