Labor and Industry, Division of

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0192Occupational Safety and Health - Inspections and Assessments of Civil Penalties - LimitationsDelegate SerafiniIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0370
    (SB0777)
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship ProgramsDelegate McCrayIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0404
    (SB0279)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsDelegate Barnes, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0478Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0528Labor and Employment - Wage Records, Wages, and Paydays - RequirementsDelegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0695Public Safety - Vertical Reciprocating Conveyors - Safety StandardsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPublic Safety (E4)
HB0969
    (SB0688)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1027Labor and Employment - Overwork Prohibition ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1051
    (SB0424)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0279
    (HB0404)
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsSenator MontgomeryIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0424
    (HB1051)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0425Labor and Employment - Wage Disclosure and Discussion ProtectionSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0688
    (HB0969)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0777
    (HB0370)
Prevailing Wage - Payment for Apprenticeship ProgramsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.