Labor and Industry, Division of

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0197
    (SB0623)
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016Delegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0343
    (SB0993)
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - RequirementDelegate Young, K.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0721
    (SB0711)
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016Delegate DavisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0977Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health RequirementsDelegate GlennIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1003 / CH0557
    (SB0481 / CH0556)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkDelegate ValderramaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 557Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1004 / CH0639Equal Pay Commission - EstablishmentDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Economic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1372
    (SB0940)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip Credit (Fight for Fifteen)Delegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1442Payment of Wages - Use of Debit Cards and Card Accounts - RegulationsDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1615
    (SB1126 / CH0470)
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High SchoolDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0090 / CH0342Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for FraudChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0092 / CH0343Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0275
    (HB0092)
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required CrewSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0481 / CH0556
    (HB1003 / CH0557)
Labor and Employment - Equal Pay for Equal WorkSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0623
    (HB0197)
Maryland Pay Stub Transparency Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0711
    (HB0721)
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2016Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0940
    (HB1372)
Labor and Employment - Payment of Wages - Minimum Wage and Repeal of Tip CreditSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0993
    (HB0343)
Procurement - Equal Pay Certificates - RequirementSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB1126 / CH0470
    (HB1615)
Frederick County - Linking Youth to New Experiences (LYNX) High SchoolSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 470Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.