Landlord and Tenant

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 34

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0005Real Property - Residential Leases - Voter RegistrationDelegate Lewis, J.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0133Maryland Stadium Authority - Ocean City Convention Facility - RenovationChair, Appropriations CommitteeIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0254Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful CollectionsChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0256Prince George's County - Landlord-Tenant Cases - Alternative Dispute Resolution Program PG 409-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0304
    (SB0801)
Environment - Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing - Elevated Blood Lead LevelsDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0415Montgomery and Prince George's Counties - Public Utilities - Property Management PG/MC 109-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0472
    (SB0493)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)Delegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0494
    (SB0555)
Safe Neighborhoods ActDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-22)Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0533 / CH0355
    (SB0494 / CH0356)
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact – Department of Planning – Name CorrectionDelegate CarrApproved by the Governor - Chapter 355Environment and Transportation
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0545Landlord-Tenant Action - Body Attachment - Prohibition (Jared Kushner Act)Delegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0580
    (SB0250)
Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government BenefitsDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0602Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0832
    (SB0520)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - ProceduresDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0852
    (SB0524)
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction ComplianceDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0942Real Property – Body Attachments – Debt Related to Residential TenancyDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Real Property (N1)
HB0995Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1073
    (SB0468 / CH0514)
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer BillsDelegate HolmesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1257 / CH0787Residential Leases - Lease Option Agreements - Required StatementsDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 787Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1329 / CH0646
    (SB1102 / CH0645)
Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of ProcessDelegate BeidleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1470Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer BillingDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1553 / CH0637
    (SB0826 / CH0638)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful EvictionsDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1593 / CH0329Real Property – Mobile Home Parks – Notices to ResidentsDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0250
    (HB0580)
Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government BenefitsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0468 / CH0514
    (HB1073)
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Leases - Water and Sewer BillsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 514Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0493
    (HB0472)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)Senator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0494 / CH0356
    (HB0533 / CH0355)
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Department of Planning - Name CorrectionSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 356Finance
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0520
    (HB0832)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - ProceduresSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0524
    (HB0852)
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Lead Risk Reduction ComplianceSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0555
    (HB0494)
Safe Neighborhoods ActSenator HoughIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0801
    (HB0304)
Environment – Reduction of Lead Risk in Housing – Elevated Blood Lead LevelsSenator OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0826 / CH0638
    (HB1553 / CH0637)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful EvictionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB1102 / CH0645
    (HB1329 / CH0646)
Landlord and Tenant - Action for Repossession of Nonresidential Property - Service of ProcessSenator CassillyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 645Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.