Land Records

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0378 / CH0108Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - ReimbursementDelegate StocksdaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0621 / CH0625
    (SB0627)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 625Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0917Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and QuarantineDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB0946Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1008Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013Delegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1209 / CH0268
    (SB0436 / CH0267)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsDelegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1455 / CH0687Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Property Tax - Payment in Lieu of Taxes Agreement MC/PG 118-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 687Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0028Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance AbatementSenator YoungIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0436 / CH0267
    (HB1209 / CH0268)
Recordation Taxes - ExemptionsSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0627
    (HB0621 / CH0625)
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract ProgramSenator RamirezIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.