Land Records

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0633 / CH0423
    (SB0578 / CH0424)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1246
    (SB0954)
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned PropertyDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1363State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of TransportationDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0578 / CH0424
    (HB0633 / CH0423)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 424Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0954
    (HB1246)
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned PropertySenator EckardtIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 15, 2018 1:58 P.M.