Language

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0086Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - EstablishmentDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0527Labor and Employment - Earned Sick LeaveDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0741 / CH0533
    (SB0601 / CH0532)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramDelegate BohananApproved by the Governor - Chapter 533Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0968
    (SB0753)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1404Health Care Disparities, Cultural and Linguistic Competency, and Health Literacy - Continuing EducationDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Health Occupations (J2)
SB0601 / CH0532
    (HB0741 / CH0533)
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative ProgramSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 532Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0753
    (HB0968)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.