Laws and Ordinances

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 28

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0231Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 405-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0252Land Use - AgritourismChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0309 / CH0070Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - RegulationAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0396
    (SB0354)
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation FeeDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0410 / CH0129Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority PG/MC 108-18Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 129Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0464
    (SB0189)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income EmployeesDelegate AliIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0491 / CH0258
    (SB0267 / CH0259)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust ProvisionsDelegate WestApproved by the Governor - Chapter 258Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0965Vehicle Laws - Left Lane - Use for PassingDelegate FoldenIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1050
    (SB1022)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Public Safety OfficersDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1095
    (SB0865)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1099
    (SB0868)
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - PenaltiesDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB1363State Roads Commission - Eminent Domain - "Quick Take" Process on Behalf of the Department of TransportationDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/9/2018 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1385
    (SB1085)
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement DistrictDelegate AndersonIn the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1390Land Use - Development Rights and Responsibilities Agreements - Enhanced Public BenefitsDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1434Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Housing for Victims of Domestic Violence PG 432-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1767
    (SB1188)
Wireless Facilities – Permitting and SitingDelegate DavisIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0189
    (HB0464)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income EmployeesSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0267 / CH0259
    (HB0491 / CH0258)
Estates and Trusts - Maryland Trust Act - Governing Law of Trust ProvisionsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Judicial Proceedings
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0354
    (HB0396)
Local Government - Agricultural Land Preservation FeeSenator MiddletonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0571Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Use of Land - Signs and Outdoor Advertising DisplaysSenator BatesIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0662 / CH0206
    (HB0645 / CH0205)
Business Regulation – Wireless Security Systems – Local Government Licenses and PermitsSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Finance
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0865
    (HB1095)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0866Commercial Law - Maryland Uniform Electronic Transactions Act - RevisionsSenator FeldmanIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0868
    (HB1099)
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - PenaltiesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0928Prince George’s County – Property Tax Credit – Grocery StoresSenator BensonIn the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB1022
    (HB1050)
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Rental Discount for Baltimore City Public Safety OfficersSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB1085
    (HB1385)
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement DistrictSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1188
    (HB1767)
Wireless Facilities - Permitting and SitingSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing canceledFinanceUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.