Leave

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0055Labor and Employment - Sick Leave Policy - RequirementDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0391
    (SB0224 / CH0208)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness ProgramDelegate KrebsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0495 / CH0478
    (SB0476 / CH0477)
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - ClarificationDelegate GriffithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 478Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2013 - 8:30 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0718
    (SB0813 / CH0556)
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick LeaveDelegate SerafiniVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0735
    (SB0698)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0804 / CH0548
    (SB0784 / CH0547)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancyDelegate HuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 548Economic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsHuman Relations (D5)
HB0956
    (SB0719)
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to EmployersDelegate Turner, V.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1331Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1334Employment Discrimination - Leave for Pregnancy and ChildbirthDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
Appropriations
Human Relations (D5)
HB1363State Law Enforcement Officers - Compensatory Leave - Cash Compensation and Creditable ServiceDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0012 / CH0163Labor and Employment - Leave - Deployment of Family Members in the Armed ForcesSenator ZirkinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 163Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0085 / CH0021Maryland Port Commission - Management Personnel Appointments - Operating and Managing Port FacilitiesChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Finance
1/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0224 / CH0208
    (HB0391)
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Wellness ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Finance
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0476 / CH0477
    (HB0495 / CH0478)
State Retirement and Pension System - Unused Sick Leave Calculation - ClarificationSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 477Budget and Taxation
2/7/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0698
    (HB0735)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0719
    (HB0956)
State and Local Government - Economic Aid - Award to EmployersSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0784 / CH0547
    (HB0804 / CH0548)
Employment Discrimination - Reasonable Accommodations for Disabilities Due to PregnancySenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 547Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersHuman Relations (D5)
SB0813 / CH0556
    (HB0718)
State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Unused Sick LeaveSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Budget and Taxation
2/21/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Appropriations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.