Leave

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0087 / CH0336
    (SB0747 / CH0335)
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - CompensationAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Ways and Means
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0216Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation for Unused Leave on Termination of EmploymentDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB0527Labor and Employment - Earned Sick LeaveDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0805 / CH0553
    (SB0763 / CH0552)
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of PersonnelDelegate Haddaway-RiccioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 553Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0935
    (SB0505)
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term SupportsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0968
    (SB0753)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1026 / CH0334
    (SB0737 / CH0333)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 334Economic Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1274Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of OwnershipDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Public Safety (E4)
HB1299Income Tax - Rate and Subtraction Modification - Parental Leave for EmployeesDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1417 / CH0251Unemployment Insurance - Work SharingChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 251Economic Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Unemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0147State Personnel - Employees in Legislative Branch of State Government - Sick Leave Incentive ProgramSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0505
    (HB0935)
Task Force on Family Caregiving and Long-Term SupportsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0737 / CH0333
    (HB1026 / CH0334)
Labor and Employment - Unpaid Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 333Finance
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0747 / CH0335
    (HB0087 / CH0336)
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - CompensationSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
SB0753
    (HB0968)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Earned Sick and Safe Leave ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0763 / CH0552
    (HB0805 / CH0553)
Talbot County - Child Support Enforcement - Transfer of PersonnelSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 552Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0939 / CH0362State Retirement and Pension System - Service Credit for Leave of Absence - Extension of Purchase PeriodSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.