Leave

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0001
    (SB0230)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0065Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate JacksonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0214Discrimination in Employment - Conditions Related to Pregnancy or ChildbirthDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0324
    (SB0580)
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal LeaveDelegate KormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0382
    (SB0305)
Commonsense Paid Leave ActSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/10/2017 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0854Units of State Government - Award of Grants to Counties - Requirement of Paid Sick LeaveDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1095Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Time Period for EligibilityDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0230
    (HB0001)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator MiddletonIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0305
    (HB0382)
Commonsense Paid Leave ActPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0580
    (HB0324)
State Personnel - Leap Year - Personal LeaveSenator MathiasIn the House - Favorable Report by AppropriationsFinance
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)

March 23, 2017 2:03 P.M.