Legal Aid

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0084
    (SB0116 / CH0049)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0551 / CH0271Education - Children With Disabilities - Individualized Education Program MediationDelegate KaiserApproved by the Governor - Chapter 271Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0580
    (SB0472)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
FinancePrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0589Office of the Public Defender - Representation at Bail Hearing - ProvisionalDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0591Office of the Public Defender - Eligibility for ServicesDelegate VallarioIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0796
    (SB0801)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant Law - Actions for Repossession (Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters Act)Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0866
    (SB0833)
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic ViolenceDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB1515Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Indigency DeterminationsDelegate AndersonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1582
    (SB1071)
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload StandardsDelegate Wilson, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1634 / CH0655
    (SB1072)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemDelegate JalisiApproved by the Governor - Chapter 655Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1638Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - FundingDelegate McKayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0116 / CH0049
    (HB0084)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0472
    (HB0580)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0656Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First RespondersSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0801
    (HB0796)
Fairness and Integrity for Baltimore City Renters ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0833
    (HB0866)
Civil Right to Counsel - Pilot Program - Domestic ViolenceSenator GuzzoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1071
    (HB1582)
Office of the Public Defender - Caseload StandardsSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1072
    (HB1634 / CH0655)
Task Force to Study the Restraint, Searches, and Needs of Children in the Juvenile Justice SystemSenator MuseIn the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB1134Criminal Procedure - Initial Appearance Before a District Court Commissioner - Costs for Appointed Legal RepresentationSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB1156Criminal Procedure - Determination of Eligibility for Services - Office of the Public DefenderSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/11 at 2:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.