Legislation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0075Calvert County - Board of License Commissioners - Notice and Hearing on Proposed LegislationCalvert County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0183
    (SB0330 / CH0159)
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - LegalizationBaltimore County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0427Voters' Legislative Districting Panel - EstablishmentDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0428Voters' Congressional Districting Panel - EstablishmentDelegate FlanaganIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0604
    (SB0166)
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeDelegate MoonIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0659Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate AndersonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0678
    (SB0478)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0787Dedicated State Funds Protection ActDelegate McMillanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0803 / CH0456Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - LegalizationDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0906Legislative and Congressional Districting - Standards and ProcessesDelegate MieleIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0989
    (SB0713)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesDelegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB1034Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Governing Bodies of Municipal Corporations Exercising Zoning Authority PG 420-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationEthics (G2)
HB1059
    (SB0686)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActDelegate Barnes, D.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1102Video Lottery Facilities - Table Games - Distribution of ProceedsDelegate BarkleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsGaming (C7)
HB1105
    (SB0761 / CH0382)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationDisabled (O3)
SB0043State Government - Governor - Approval of Duplicative BillsSenator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0166
    (HB0604)
General Assembly - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy in OfficeSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0183 / CH0477
    (HB0215)
Education - Geographic Cost of Education - RequirementSenator KingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 477Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesPresidentVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0330 / CH0159
    (HB0183)
Baltimore County Code of Public Local Laws - 2015 Edition - LegalizationSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0370 / CH0164Unmanned Aircraft Systems Research, Development, Regulation, and Privacy Act of 2015Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 164Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0478
    (HB0678)
General Assembly - Fiscal Notes - Criminal Justice Policy Impact StatementsSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0660State BudgetSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0686
    (HB1059)
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0713
    (HB0989)
State Government - Legislation Impacting Local Government Land Use Decisions - Economic Impact AnalysesSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/5/2015 - 9:00 a.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0761 / CH0382
    (HB1105)
Disabled Individuals - Task Force on the Maryland ABLE ProgramSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 382Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Disabled (O3)
SB0764Video Lottery Terminals - Changes Affecting Proceeds - Legislative ApprovalSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and TaxationGaming (C7)
SB0765Video Lottery Facilities - Table Games - Distribution of ProceedsSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesGaming (C7)
SB0885Education Funding and Formulas - Amendment - Supermajority VoteSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/18/2015 - 1:30 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.