Libel and Slander

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 2

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0131 / CH0096Commercial Law - Nondisparagement Clauses in Consumer Contracts - ProhibitionDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 96Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0764 / CH0229Education - Student Journalists - Freedom of Speech and Freedom of the PressSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.