Libraries

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0138
    (SB0338)
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of MarylandDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0144
    (SB0337 / CH0549)
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - FundingDelegate HixsonIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB1225
    (SB1137)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation and ExpansionDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1375Public Schools and Libraries - Access to Obscene Materials and Child Pornography - ProhibitedDelegate ParrottIn the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1401 / CH0715
    (SB1171 / CH0714)
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - FundingDelegate Robinson, B.Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 715Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)
HB1402 / CH0032
    (SB1125)
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement ActDelegate McIntoshEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32Ways and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0337 / CH0549
    (HB0144)
Libraries - Regional, State, and County - FundingSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 549Budget and Taxation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0338
    (HB0138)
Task Force to Study the Placement of Library Services Within the Education Article of the Annotated Code of MarylandSenator KingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB1125
    (HB1402 / CH0032)
Education - Public School Opportunities Enhancement ActSenator FergusonVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1137
    (HB1225)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Noyes Children's Library Renovation and ExpansionSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 11:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/12/2016 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1171 / CH0714
    (HB1401 / CH0715)
Enoch Pratt Free Library - Hours of Operation - FundingSenator PughEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 714Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Local Bills (F3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.