License Plates

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0051Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0320 / CH0033
    (SB0217 / CH0032)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore CountyBaltimore County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 33Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0374
    (SB0212 / CH0206)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with DisabilitiesDelegate MaloneVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0562Vehicle Laws - Single Registration PlateDelegate ElliottIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0577Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates - Vehicle Manufactured Without Means to Display Front PlateDelegate ElliottIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:15 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0723 / CH0274
    (SB0460 / CH0273)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeDelegate TarrantApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0770
    (SB0742 / CH0312)
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore CityDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0977
    (SB0039 / CH0170)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration PlateDelegate McDermottVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0039 / CH0170
    (HB0977)
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration PlateSenator ColburnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 170Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0212 / CH0206
    (HB0374)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Motorcycles - Individuals with DisabilitiesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0217 / CH0032
    (HB0320 / CH0033)
Vehicle Laws - Registration Plates for Individuals with Disabilities - Parking in Baltimore CountySenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 32Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0460 / CH0273
    (HB0723 / CH0274)
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to PracticeSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 273Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0742 / CH0312
    (HB0770)
Vehicle Laws - Residential Parking in Baltimore CitySenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.