License Plates

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0077Vehicle Laws - Single Registration Plate - Class L (Historic) Vehicles and Class N (Street Rod) VehiclesDelegate McMillanIn the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0095Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plate - United States Armed ForcesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0289
    (SB0699 / CH0192)
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized UsesDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0320Vehicle Laws - Displaying Front Registration Plate - Exemption for Class L (Historic) and Class N (Street Rod) VehiclesDelegate ElliottIn the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0327Vehicle Laws - Single Registration PlateDelegate ElliottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0004Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Appalachian TrailSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0350 / CH0490Speed Monitoring Systems Reform Act of 2014Senator BrochinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 490Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0699 / CH0192
    (HB0289)
Automatic License Plate Readers and Captured Plate Data - Authorized UsesSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 192Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0773Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the RoadSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.