Liens

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0066 / CH0088Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - RepealChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 88Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
HB0387 / CH0593
    (SB0912 / CH0592)
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - StudyDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 593Economic Matters
2/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0538Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure SaleDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0684 / CH0029
    (SB0558)
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - CodifiedDelegate HammenEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0920 / CH0396
    (SB0509 / CH0395)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0989 / CH0638
    (SB0815)
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer ChargesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1017 / CH0369
    (SB0256 / CH0368)
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 369Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1082Prince George's County - Property Tax Bill - Statement of Lien PG 433-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1154
    (SB0951)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Judiciary)Environment and Transportation
Judiciary
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1306Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle ForfeitureDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB1496Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1552Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Polybutylene Connection Pipe Replacement Loan Program PG/MC 115-16Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County DelegationIn the Senate - Recommitted to Finance (Senator Middleton)Environment and Transportation
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
SB0256 / CH0368
    (HB1017 / CH0369)
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled HomeownersSenator CurrieApproved by the Governor - Chapter 368Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0509 / CH0395
    (HB0920 / CH0396)
Real Property - Actions to Quiet TitleSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0558
    (HB0684 / CH0029)
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - CodifiedSenator FergusonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0761Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0815
    (HB0989 / CH0638)
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer ChargesSenator MuseIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0912 / CH0592
    (HB0387 / CH0593)
Clean Energy Loan Program - Residential Property - StudySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 592Finance
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB0951
    (HB1154)
Maryland Lead Poisoning Recovery ActSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.