Lieutenant Governor

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0070Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means Elections (G1)
HB0733Drunk Driving - State Officials - Mandatory Minimum SentenceDelegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0942State Government - Use of Public Resources - Reimbursement by Elected State OfficialsDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1179Public Ethics - Former Members of the General Assembly, Legislative Branch Officials, and Executive Branch Officials - Lobbying RestrictionsDelegate BoboIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1269Maryland Small Donor Incentive ActDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HJ0003 / JR0002
    (SJ0003 / JR0001)
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant GovernorSpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 2Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SJ0003 / JR0001
    (HJ0003 / JR0002)
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant GovernorPresidentEnacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.