Limited Liability Companies

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0142General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - ProhibitedDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0259Campaign Finance - Affiliated Business Entities - Attribution of ContributionsDelegate BoboIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0347 / CH0613Professional Engineers - Firm PermitsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 613Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0372 / CH0453
    (SB0202 / CH0452)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - ExemptionDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 453Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0404Alcoholic Beverages - Issuance of Class A, C, and D LicensesSenator FeldmanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
HB0540Criminal Procedure - Search Warrants - Foreign EntitiesDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0702 / CH0068
    (SB0622 / CH0067)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0881Corporations and Associations - Limited Liability Companies - Company RepresentativeDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1140 / CH0528
    (SB0697 / CH0527)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB1246
    (SB0469)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1291
    (SB0554)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1330 / CH0676Workers' Compensation - Insurance Coverage - Employer ComplianceChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Economic Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Workers' Compensation (K1)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
SB0001Income Tax - Pass-Through Entity - Maximum RateSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0070 / CH0175Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland ProgramChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0179Architects, Landscape Architects, and Professional Land Surveyors - Firm PermitsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0202 / CH0452
    (HB0372 / CH0453)
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - ExemptionSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 452Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
SB0469
    (HB1246)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0554
    (HB1291)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0622 / CH0067
    (HB0702 / CH0068)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0697 / CH0527
    (HB1140 / CH0528)
Corporations and Associations - ConversionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 527Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.