Long-Term Care

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0100 / CH0381Dental Hygienists - Practice in Long-Term Care Facilities - Repeal of Termination DateDelegate KipkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 381Health and Government Operations
1/23/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0271
    (SB0276)
Continuing Care Retirement Communities - Continuing Care Agreements - Actuarial StudiesDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0637
    (SB0537)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver AmendmentDelegate HubbardIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0778Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsDelegate HubbardIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0846Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Viatical Settlement Contracts - Long-Term Care ServicesDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0906Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic TestingDelegate PendergrassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1267 / CH0353
    (SB0882 / CH0352)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder WorkgroupDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 353Health and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1511Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check ProgramChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0013Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program Advisory CommitteeChair, Finance CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
1/9/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Elderly (O2)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0478Income Tax - Credit for Long-Term Care PremiumsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0537
    (HB0637)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Rare and Expensive Case Management Program - Waiver AmendmentSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0721Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Services for Children With Down Syndrome (Micah's Law)Senator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0882 / CH0352
    (HB1267 / CH0353)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Outpatient Services Programs Stakeholder WorkgroupSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Finance
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.