Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, State

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0027Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
1/26/2016 - 3:30 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0084
    (SB0116 / CH0049)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsSpeakerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/2/2016 - 12:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0930Fantasy Competitions - Regulatory AuthorityDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0965 / CH0727The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016Delegate WalkerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Horse Racing (C6)
HB1558Prince George's County - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data CollectionDelegate Howard, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsGaming (C7)
SB0078 / CH0044State Lottery and Video Lottery Facility Payouts - Remittance of Intercepted PrizesChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0111 / CH0020State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Prize PaymentsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0116 / CH0049
    (HB0084)
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit RequirementsPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 49Budget and Taxation
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0941 / CH0595Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming LicensesSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 595Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0980Gaming - Traditional Noncommercial Fantasy Competitions - ClarificationSenator MillerIn the House - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1070
    (HB1574)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.