Lottery

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0202 / CH0479
    (SB1004)
Pilot Program - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Maryland Veterans Trust FundDelegate BromwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 479Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0300
    (SB1108)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsDelegate FennellIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0647
    (SB0543)
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of ProceedsDelegate JamesonIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0706 / CH0692
    (SB0687 / CH0691)
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Entertainment Facility LicensesDelegate JamesonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0707 / CH0195
    (SB0372 / CH0194)
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and RestitutionDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 195Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0728State Lottery - Licensed Agents - CommissionsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB0761
    (SB0733)
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsCecil County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1094Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants PG 313-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1490
    (SB0864 / CH0516)
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)Delegate LiermanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1540
    (SB1025)
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership CostsAllegany County DelegationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsGaming (C7)
HB1558Prince George's County - Video Lottery Operation Licensee - Employee Data CollectionDelegate Howard, C.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsGaming (C7)
HB1574
    (SB1070)
Certified Business Enterprises - Gaming and Lottery Control Commission Contracts - PreferencesDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0111 / CH0020State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Prize PaymentsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0265Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake IdentificationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0319State Lottery - Licensed Agents - CommissionsSenator DeGrangeIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0328
    (HB0220)
Criminal Procedure - ExpungementSenator ConwayIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0372 / CH0194
    (HB0707 / CH0195)
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and RestitutionSenator PetersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 194Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0543
    (HB0647)
Video Lottery Facilities - Charles County - Expansion and Use of ProceedsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0687 / CH0691
    (HB0706 / CH0692)
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Entertainment Facility LicensesSenator MiddletonEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 691Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0733
    (HB0761)
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsCecil County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0864 / CH0516
    (HB1490)
Public Safety - Internet Crimes Against Children Task Force Fund - Establishment (Alicia's Law)Senator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0907
    (HB0672)
Transportation - Harry W. Nice Memorial Potomac River Bridge - ReplacementSenator MiddletonVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB1004
    (HB0202 / CH0479)
Pilot Program - Donation of Coins From Gaming Payouts - Maryland Veterans Trust FundSenator KlausmeierIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1025
    (HB1540)
Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Ownership CostsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB1108
    (HB0300)
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed WinningsSenator SallingIn the House - Favorable Report by Ways and MeansBudget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
Gaming (C7)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:05 P.M.