Maps and Charts

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0743 / CH0537
    (SB0604 / CH0536)
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund ExpendituresDelegate ClagettApproved by the Governor - Chapter 537Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0970General Assembly and Congressional Legislative Redistricting and Apportionment CommissionDelegate HoganIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1213Maryland Congressional Redistricting CommissionDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1327
    (SB0582)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0394Statewide Container Recycling Refund ProgramSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment (M3)
SB0582
    (HB1327)
Election Law - Redistricting Ballot Questions - Map of Proposed DistrictsSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0604 / CH0536
    (HB0743 / CH0537)
Income Tax Forms - Graphical Representation of General Fund ExpendituresSenator MannoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 536Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.