Maryland Register

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016
    (SB0261)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0560 / CH0005
    (SB0538)
Public-Private PartnershipsSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 5Environmental Matters
2/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0605Public-Private PartnershipsDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing cancelled (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
Appropriations
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0736
    (SB0928)
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsDelegate KipkeIn the House - Referred to interim study by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1191
    (SB0623)
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013Delegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1204
    (SB0683)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0261
    (HB0016)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0538
    (HB0560 / CH0005)
Public-Private PartnershipsPresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0623
    (HB1191)
Maryland Assault Weapons Ban of 2013Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
SB0683
    (HB1204)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Wage and Hour Law - Payment of WagesSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0928
    (HB0736)
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Specialty DrugsSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Insurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.