Massage

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0166Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0309 / CH0070Anne Arundel County - Practice of Massage - RegulationAnne Arundel County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 70Health and Government Operations
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1598Massage Therapists - Licenses and Registrations - Education and Display RequirementsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Passed EnrolledHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 12, 2018 4:40 P.M.