Mass Transit

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 31

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0202Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Transit VehiclesDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0234 / CH0360Transportation - Baltimore Corridor Red Line Transit StudyDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 360Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0287
    (SB0386)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Study of Paratransit Services for Dialysis PatientsDelegate HubbardIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0688Criminal Law - Assault Against a Transit Vehicle OperatorDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0700Criminal Law - Assault Against a Transit Vehicle PassengerDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0755Transportation - Transit Vehicle Operators - Prohibition on Use of Wireless Communication DevicesDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0771Mass Transit Trust FundDelegate BatesIn the House - Reassigned to Ways and Means and AppropriationsWays and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0784Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate IncreaseDelegate SchulzIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0938Transit Service - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0958
    (SB0685)
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Metro Transit PoliceDelegate BarnesIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsAppropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1000Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate OaksIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1093Transit Vehicles - Prohibited Acts - Use of Obscene LanguageDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1142Mass Transit - Failure to Vacate Seat Designated for Elderly or Handicapped - PenaltyDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1239Washington Metropolitan Area Transit District - Establishment of Sales Outlets in Prince George's County MC/PG 117-13Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1322Transportation Infrastructure BankDelegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1432 / CH0684Prince George's County - Public Safety Surcharge PG 421-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 684Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1433 / CH0685Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge PG 420-13Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 685Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0182Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - ProhibitionSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno)Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0253Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0386
    (HB0287)
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Study of Paratransit Services for Dialysis PatientsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0643
    (HB0524)
End the GridlockSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0652Motor Fuel - Mass Transit Tax - Transit FundingSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0653Sales and Use Tax - Mass TransitSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0685
    (HB0958)
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Metro Transit PoliceSenator GaragiolaIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator MillerAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0830Transportation Financing ActSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB1013Transportation Trust Fund - Use of Funds - Transit FinancingSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.