Mass Transit

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0619Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - ProhibitionDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0636 / CH0605Maryland Transit Administration - Commuter Benefits ProgramDelegate AroraApproved by the Governor - Chapter 605Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0842Public Safety - Drug Treatment Court - Baltimore CityDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary Public Safety (E4)
HB1123Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014Delegate ClagettIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1279
    (SB0627)
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax LimitationsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1326
    (SB0754)
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - RequirementDelegate ReznikIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1338State Construction Projects - Work-Based Learning and Local HiringDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1416Crimes - Gang-Free Zones - Penalties for Gang ActivityDelegate MitchellIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1427Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's CountyDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1442Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate OaksIn the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1491 / CH0657Transportation - Citizens' Advisory Council for the Baltimore Corridor Transit Study - Red LineDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 657Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0239Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and LimitationsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0627
    (HB1279)
Special Taxing Districts - Transportation Improvements and Exemption From County Tax LimitationsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0754
    (HB1326)
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - RequirementSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0772Transit Benefit DistrictsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 2:30 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0885State Pension System - Concessionaires and Other Private Entities - ParticipationSenator Jones-RodwellIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB1035Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line ExtensionSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.