Mass Transit

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0119 / CH0003Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority - Washington Metrorail Safety Commission - Establishment and CompactChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0149 / CH0112Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight AuthorityChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0219 / CH0046Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActCarroll County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Judiciary
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0271 / CH0024
    (SB0484 / CH0016)
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - RepealDelegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24Appropriations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0285 / CH0352
    (SB0265 / CH0351)
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership ActDelegate KormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 352Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0713Sales and Use Tax - Light Rail Vehicles - ExemptionChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Passed EnrolledWays and Means
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0907
    (SB0850)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkDelegate LisantiIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1043Vehicle Laws - Smoking Marijuana in Vehicles - ProhibitionDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1050
    (SB1065)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1132
    (SB1149)
Maryland Transit Administration - Free Ridership for State EmployeesDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1568 / CH0336Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 415-17Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1593
    (SB1175)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Transit Oriented Development Public Art ProjectsDelegate GainesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1636Prince George's County - School Facilities and Public Safety Surcharges - Maryland Transit Administration Station PG 430-17Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Passed EnrolledEnvironment and Transportation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1651Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Ridership of Executive Branch Employees - Fare RequiredDelegate BarveIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0106 / CH0045Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims ActSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0265 / CH0351
    (HB0285 / CH0352)
Washington Metrorail Safety Commission Membership ActSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 351Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0445Criminal Law - Smoking Marijuana in a Public Place - ProhibitionSenator CassillyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0484 / CH0016
    (HB0271 / CH0024)
Maryland Transit Administration - Farebox Recovery Rate - RepealSenator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 16Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0850
    (HB0907)
Chesapeake Bay Water Transportation NetworkSenator MathiasIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0963Transportation - Transit Service - State GrantsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1065
    (HB1050)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB1149
    (HB1132)
Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School StudentsSenator OaksIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1175
    (HB1593)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Transit Oriented Development Public Art ProjectsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:59 P.M.