Mediation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0346 / CH0414Court Personnel - Altering References from Master to MagistrateDelegate MoralesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 414Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0385
    (SB0040)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 12:30 p.m.Economic Matters
2/13/2015 - 12:30 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0388
    (SB0602 / CH0042)
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating CouncilDelegate DumaisVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0478Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - ProhibitionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0755 / CH0136
    (SB0695 / CH0135)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 136Health and Government Operations
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0791
    (SB0388)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Restorative Justice ProgramsDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0829
    (SB0570)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsDelegate FrushIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0966Education - Community Colleges - Collective BargainingDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0969
    (SB0688)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1019
    (SB0532)
Farmers' Rights ActDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB1027Labor and Employment - Overwork Prohibition ActDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1060Special Education - Individualized Education Program Facilitated MeetingsDelegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1168Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile MediationDelegate McConkeyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0040
    (HB0385)
Labor and Employment - Maryland Healthy Working Families ActSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0252Interstate Medical Licensure CompactSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0388
    (HB0791)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Restorative Justice ProgramsSenator HoughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0532
    (HB1019)
Farmers' Rights ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0570
    (HB0829)
Condominiums - Warranty ClaimsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0602 / CH0042
    (HB0388)
Justice Reinvestment Coordinating CouncilSenator MillerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0609
    (HB1022)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot ProgramSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0688
    (HB0969)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0695 / CH0135
    (HB0755 / CH0136)
General Provisions - Public Information Act - Enforcement, Fees, and ExemptionsSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 135Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.