Mentors

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0823Education - Public School Teachers - PreparationDelegate LuedtkeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0827
    (SB0669)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1525
    (SB0727)
State Personnel – Employee Mentoring LeaveDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.Appropriations
3/1/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
SB0669
    (HB0827)
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Diversion ProgramSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0727
    (HB1525)
State Personnel - Employee Mentoring LeaveSenator KingIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)

March 16, 2018 6:23 P.M.