Mergers and Acquisitions

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0472 / CH0250
    (SB0207)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsDelegate JamesonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 250Economic Matters
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0522 / CH0256
    (SB0681)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0207
    (HB0472 / CH0250)
Telephone Companies - Streamlined Regulatory RequirementsSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0681
    (HB0522 / CH0256)
Corporations - Maryland General Corporation Law - Miscellaneous ProvisionsSenator FeldmanIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCorporations and Associations (C1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:42 P.M.