Militia

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0038Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Applicant QualificationsDelegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0195Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Health Care Pensions - Health Care Workforce ShortageDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0225 / CH0155
    (SB0273 / CH0154)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0359 / CH0614Militia - Maryland Defense Force - Enlistment PeriodChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 614Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0401 / CH0112Military Department - Powers of the Adjutant General - Summary Courts-MartialChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Health and Government Operations
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0558Maryland Liberty Preservation Act of 2013Delegate DwyerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0273 / CH0154
    (HB0225 / CH0155)
Veterans Full Employment Act of 2013PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 154Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2013 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.