Mobile and Manufactured Homes

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0249 / CH0489
    (SB0345 / CH0488)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB0422
    (SB0991)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0628 / CH0285
    (SB0238 / CH0284)
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality RequirementsDelegate Robinson, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 285Health and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0683Real Property - Residential and Mobile Home Park Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1403 / CH0109Homestead Exemption - Bankruptcy - Interest in Manufactured HomeDelegate NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 109Judiciary
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0174Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of PaymentSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0238 / CH0284
    (HB0628 / CH0285)
Board of Public Works - Relocatable Classrooms - Indoor Air Quality RequirementsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 284Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0345 / CH0488
    (HB0249 / CH0489)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0609Environment - Bay Restoration Fee - Mobile Home ParkSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0991
    (HB0422)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedSenator KingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.